Directorate Change (6322E)
June 01 2012 - 5:58AM
UK Regulatory
TIDMGO.
RNS Number : 6322E
GlobeOp Financial Services S.A.
01 June 2012
GLOBEOP FINANCIAL SERVICES S.A. (the "Company")
Date: 1 June 2012
Board changes
Following the announcement on 31 May 2012 that SS&C
Technologies Holding Europe S.a r.l.'s cash offer for the Company
is wholly unconditional, the Company announces that each of Edward
Nicoll, Jonathan Meeks, Eileen Fusco, David Gelber and Arun Seth
have resigned from the board, effective as of 31 May 2012.
The Company is also pleased to announce the appointment of each
of William C. Stone, Normand A. Boulanger, Patrick J. Pedonti,
David N. Reid and Christophe Maillard, to the board of the Company
as non-executive directors, each effective as of 31 May 2012.
William C. Stone and Normand A. Boulanger are each directors on
the board of SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc., which is listed
on the NASDAQ Stock Exchange. There is no other information
required to be disclosed under rule 9.6.13 of the Listing
Rules.
Andrea Dulberg, General Counsel and Company Secretary
GlobeOp Financial Services S.A.
For further information contact:
GlobeOp Financial Services
Andrea Dulberg +1 914 670 3731
RLM Finsbury
+ 44 (0) 20 7251 3801
Faeth Birch + 44 (0) 7768 943 171
Sarah Heald + 44 (0) 7771 982 101
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAUGUAAQUPPUBG
Globeop (LSE:GO.)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2024 to Oct 2024
Globeop (LSE:GO.)
Historical Stock Chart
From Oct 2023 to Oct 2024