Directorate Change
June 29 2004 - 5:05AM
UK Regulatory
RNS Number:2413A
Hartstone Group PLC
29 June 2004
For immediate release
Not for release, publication or distribution in or into the United States,
Canada, Australia or Japan
29 June, 2004
The Hartstone Group PLC
("Hartstone" or the "Company")
Resignation of Directors
Hartstone wishes to announce the resignation as directors of the Company of each
of Struan McBride, John Hunter and Christopher Mills, with effect from 25 June
2004.
The Board changes are made as a result of the recent Offers for the Company by
Wooster Investments Pty Limited, which were declared unconditional in all
respects on 11 June 2004.
Unless the context otherwise requires, defined terms used in this announcement
shall have the meanings given to them in the Offer Document and Notices dated 14
May, 2004.
Enquiries:
The Hartstone Group PLC
Tel: (01494) 787 700
Shaun Dowling
Tony Cheng
Strand Partners Limited
Tel: (020) 7409 3494
(Financial Adviser to Hartstone)
Simon Raggett
Julian Moore
END
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAGGGZVLLFGDZG
Hartstone (LSE:HST)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2024 to Oct 2024
Hartstone (LSE:HST)
Historical Stock Chart
From Oct 2023 to Oct 2024